Accounts and annual returns VERNACULAR ARCHITECTURE GROUP

Charity number: 279839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 23 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 23 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 23 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 23 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 14 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 14 February 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 03 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 03 February 2018 On time Download Open in new window