Financial history VERNACULAR ARCHITECTURE GROUP

Charity number: 279839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £74.93k £75.79k £70.36k £58.82k £29.02k
Total expenditure £76.41k £64.54k £75.08k £46.70k £26.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A