2ND ST IVES (HUNTS) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 279852
Charity reporting is up to date (244 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 July 2021 244 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 21 December 2018 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 21 December 2018 51 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 November 2017 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 07 November 2017 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 30 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 30 July 2016 On time Download