2ND ST IVES (HUNTS) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 279852
Charity reporting is up to date (244 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROB TAYLOR Trustee 23 June 2013 None on record
HARVEY FERRIES Trustee 23 June 2013 None on record
Joanne Susan Taylor Trustee 19 June 2017 None on record
Linda Jane Moore Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
JOHN WINSTON DAVIES Chair
NOBLES FIELD RECREATION GROUND Received: On time
JOHN ANDREW HLADKIWSKYJ Trustee None on record
Claire-Joanne Stewart Trustee 24 June 2019 None on record
Alison Ann Marshall Trustee 03 September 2015 None on record
Michael David Leasure Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record