2ND ST IVES (HUNTS) SEA SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 279852
Charity reporting is up to date (244 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £32.27k £36.75k £31.69k £26.62k £23.32k
Total expenditure £14.78k £18.84k £25.95k £34.39k £21.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A