Financial history THE CHARTERED SOCIETY OF PHYSIOTHERAPY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 279882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £957.38k £487.04k £501.56k £183.11k £217.05k
Total expenditure £958.20k £329.68k £689.02k £805.99k £401.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £801.94k N/A £338.33k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment £153.33k N/A £163.23k N/A N/A
Income - Other £2.11k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £949.46k N/A £689.02k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £8.74k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £72.89k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £796.57k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £8.74k N/A £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A