ST STEPHENS WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 280192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.69k £3.00k £2.11k £2.76k £1.81k
Total expenditure £2.19k £2.71k £2.19k £2.36k £1.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A