ST STEPHENS WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 280192
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kelly Ann Twyman Trustee 01 November 2018 None on record
Catherine Elgie-Peters Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Nikki Denning Trustee 01 September 2017 None on record
Kaye Margaret Merrywest Trustee 01 November 2014
CANTERBURY AND EAST KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: 34 days late
ST. PETER'S METHODIST CHURCH CANTERBURY Received: On time
Penelope Sudlow Trustee 18 November 2019 None on record
Ethel Anderson Trustee 19 October 2014 None on record
Sarah MacMillan Trustee 21 October 2019 None on record
Felicity Lewis-Tasker Chair 17 October 2016 None on record
Helen Louise Brown Trustee 18 November 2019
CANTERBURY AND EAST KENT METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: 34 days late
ST. PETER'S METHODIST CHURCH CANTERBURY Received: On time
Julie Board Trustee 19 October 2014 None on record