STOWMARKET CHORALE

Charity number: 280488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 24 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 05 October 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 05 October 2020 127 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 07 August 2019 68 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 19 September 2018 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required