1ST BLISWORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 281629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 30 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 25 April 2017 84 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required