Trustees 1ST BLISWORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 281629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
William Alexander Hazell Chair 15 June 2022
GRAFTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL
Received: On time
Matthew Taylor Trustee 28 April 2022
None on record
John Simmonds Trustee 14 January 2022
None on record
Lynne Whitlock Trustee 14 January 2021
None on record
Katie Joanne Mynard Trustee 06 June 2017
None on record
Deborah Jane Adams Trustee 25 May 2017
None on record