Accounts and annual returns CORNWALL LEUKAEMIA TRUST

Charity number: 281979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 11 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 November 2020 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 November 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 13 November 2019 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 January 2019 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 January 2019 70 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 30 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window