Financial history RICKMANSWORTH AND WATFORD UNIT 351 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 282817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £17.04k £20.52k £19.08k £19.25k £14.09k
Total expenditure £13.00k £15.26k £16.40k £17.13k £10.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £1.70k N/A N/A