Trustees RICKMANSWORTH AND WATFORD UNIT 351 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 282817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hayley Henry Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record
Jonathan Alexander Hemmingway Trustee 15 July 2021
None on record
David Barton Trustee 27 June 2017
None on record
Nina Guppy Trustee 09 December 2015
None on record
Priyankumar Patel Trustee 09 September 2015
None on record
JOHN WALLACE CASSTLES Trustee 12 November 2002
ESSEX YEOMANRY ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
MICHAEL EDWARD MORRIS Trustee 12 November 2002
None on record