Accounts and annual returns RICKMANSWORTH AND WATFORD UNIT 351 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 282817
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required