Accounts and annual returns M AND S STORFER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 12 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 12 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 21 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 17 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 17 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 30 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window