Governance M AND S STORFER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 283151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 10 September 1981: Standard registration
  • 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 09 October 2009: Standard registration
  • 09 November 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
  • 10 March 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property