THE LONDON MARATHON CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 283813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Joseph Henry Trustee 09 October 2019 None on record
ALAN PETER PASCOE MBE Trustee 24 April 2015 None on record
SIR RODNEY WALKER Chair
ATHLETICS FOR THE YOUNG Received: On time
DAWN AUSTWICK OBE Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
Terry Duddy Trustee 09 December 2020 None on record
CLARE SHEPHERD Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
Lee Stuart Mason Trustee 15 December 2020 None on record
Samantha Orde Trustee 26 April 2019
ENGLISH FEDERATION OF DISABILITY SPORT Received: 9 days late
CHARLES MADDOCK JOHNSTON Trustee 11 December 2013 None on record
JOHN ERIC AUSTIN Trustee
PARLIAMENTARY OUTREACH TRUST Received: On time
FRIENDS OF BRIGHTON AND HOVE HOSPITALS Received: On time
GILLIAN MCKAY Trustee 25 January 2017 None on record
Robert Charles Rigby Trustee 22 September 2016 None on record