THE BRITISH GEOTECHNICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 284131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £254.49k £158.75k £163.89k £269.64k £170.68k
Total expenditure £129.63k £147.71k £156.43k £234.74k £170.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A