Trustees THE BRITISH GEOTECHNICAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 284131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Andrew Ridley | Chair | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof Giulia Viggiani | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Katerina Tsiampousi | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Davis | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kevin Mark Briggs | Trustee | 22 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Georgios Katsigiannis | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Eur Ing Stephen David Thomas | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dimitrios Daskalopoulos | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Anthony Barker | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chaido Doulala-Rigby | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Anne Markvukaj | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Eur Ing Neil Alexander Smith | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Gerard Perry | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor David Geoffrey Toll | Trustee | 21 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Kelvin Higgins | Trustee | 17 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.