THE BRITISH GEOTECHNICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 284131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 December 2018 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 December 2018 49 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 17 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 17 August 2016 On time Download