NAUTICAL MUSEUMS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 284687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £72.03k £71.16k £68.94k £69.62k £39.52k
Total expenditure £86.99k £75.86k £74.48k £60.26k £31.84k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £27.00k