Accounts and annual returns NAUTICAL MUSEUMS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 284687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 April 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 10 April 2024 On time
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window