NAUTICAL MUSEUMS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 284687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy Dennis McDonald Trustee 30 July 2016 None on record
Dr PETER RICHARD VALENTINE MARSDEN DPHIL FSA Chair 18 April 2013
PAST HISTORIC CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Alan Michael French Dodge Trustee 03 July 2020 None on record
Suzanna O'Sullivan Trustee 07 December 2020 None on record
David Robert Spooner Trustee 22 June 2018 None on record