THE FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S, LONG CRENDON

Charity number: 285163
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £18.73k £17.96k £14.53k £16.58k £12.75k
Total expenditure £8.80k £21.67k £16.63k £2.49k £1.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A