CENTRAL SCHOOL OF BALLET CHARITABLE TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 285398
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £2.54m £3.23m £3.93m £3.34m £3.98m
Total expenditure £3.05m £3.09m £3.18m £2.98m £2.73m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £592.15k £556.99k £592.91k N/A £446.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £214.00k £863.56k £1.49m £926.56k £1.78m
Income - Other trading activities £242.05k £226.78k £280.08k £258.64k £107.03k
Income - Charitable activities £2.05m £2.13m £1.54m £2.13m £1.63m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.13m
Income - Investment £26.55k £15.63k £16.30k £26.27k £16.18k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £16.40k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.70m £2.90m £2.99m £2.87m £2.60m
Expenditure - Raising funds £351.33k £193.18k £185.18k £109.78k £122.88k
Expenditure - Governance £27.55k £19.06k £15.72k £16.24k £15.20k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0