THE SURREY CARE TRUST

Charity number: 285543
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 08 June 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 08 June 2020 8 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 05 December 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 16 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 16 February 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 12 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 12 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2015 18 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2015 22 February 2016 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)