THE SURREY CARE TRUST

Charity number: 285543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £792.86k £981.34k £1.01m £1.20m £1.32m
Total expenditure £859.05k £939.99k £987.35k £1.13m £1.24m
Income from government contracts £508.84k £384.87k £303.84k £200.44k £436.01k
Income from government grants £5.48k £264.51k £228.97k £371.32k £222.07k
Income - Donations and legacies £169.19k £279.36k £303.55k £404.50k £338.59k
Income - Other trading activities £37.52k £35.72k £45.49k £61.10k £24.85k
Income - Charitable activities £585.15k £666.24k £661.00k £736.05k £955.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.00k £22 £3 £15 £21
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £722.88k £801.59k £835.91k £973.57k £1.08m
Expenditure - Raising funds £136.17k £138.40k £151.44k £157.39k £164.45k
Expenditure - Governance £25.75k £0 £6.30k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0