THE SURREY CARE TRUST

Charity number: 285543
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SIR DENIS O'CONNOR Trustee 01 June 2015
THE MIGRAINE TRUST
Julie Richardson Trustee 14 October 2020 None on record
JOHN CHAPLIN Trustee 01 January 2017
GASP MOTOR PROJECT Charity reporting is up to date
Sarah Mary Ahchoon Trustee 16 March 2020 None on record
MR R SEARLE Trustee 01 March 2018
VILLAGE HALL FUND Charity reporting is up to date
Dr NAOMI WINSTONE Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
VIVIENNE WINTER STUART Trustee 01 January 2018 None on record
RICHARD WHITTINGTON Trustee 01 March 2018
HIGH SHERIFF OF SURREY YOUTH AWARDS Charity reporting is up to date
THE GORDON FOUNDATION Charity reporting is up to date
KARI PRIDDEN Trustee 01 September 2010 None on record
Paul Downes Trustee 24 July 2020 None on record
PHILIP OSBORNE Trustee 01 November 2016
RUSHMOOR CONCERT BAND Charity reporting is up to date