Financial history THE WILLIAM AND ELLEN VINTEN TRUST

Charity number: 285758
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £117.54k £57.08k £59.48k £66.29k £42.97k
Total expenditure £80.77k £63.29k £75.18k £70.39k £39.48k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A