Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH MARITIME CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 286784
Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 107 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 107 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 March 2021 58 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 16 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 February 2019 18 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 27 February 2019 27 days late
Annual return 31 March 2017 05 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window