TOWER HAMLETS LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 287282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £413.95k £442.50k £598.89k £525.03k £554.79k
Total expenditure £462.27k £435.39k £452.85k £486.06k £548.62k
Income from government contracts £125.77k £51.30k £104.55k £61.06k £32.20k
Income from government grants £165.70k £144.59k £144.59k £120.96k £155.97k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £193.79k £181.88k £194.51k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £404.98k £342.83k £360.19k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £124 £315 £91
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £452.85k £486.06k £548.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £4.10k £0 £3.45k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0