Trustees TOWER HAMLETS LAW CENTRE

Charity number: 287282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Stephanie Leung Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Sabrina Jamil Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Philippa Salewicz Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Steven Pallett Trustee 22 February 2022
None on record
Zeno Capucci Trustee 12 October 2021
None on record
Robyn Jones Trustee 18 May 2021
None on record
Philip Justin Bartlett Trustee 14 July 2020
None on record
Yvonne Kramo Trustee 18 April 2017
None on record
Maria-Grazia Donvito Trustee 09 February 2017
None on record
JAMES BLYTHE Trustee 17 January 2017
None on record
CATE TUITT Trustee 30 November 2015
None on record
DEREK MAURICE COX OBE Trustee 18 December 2014
None on record
Rosalind Shaw Trustee 31 January 2014
None on record
MANUHAR ALI Trustee
None on record
MARK KALDERON Trustee
None on record