82ND BRISTOL (ST BERNADETTE) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 287697
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 01 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 01 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 07 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 07 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 24 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 24 July 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 13 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 13 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 29 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 29 August 2017 On time Download