Accounts and annual returns THE SINGLE HOMELESS PROJECT

Charity number: 287779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 09 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 09 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 21 January 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 22 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window