Financial history THE SINGLE HOMELESS PROJECT

Charity number: 287779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £18.94m £19.36m £21.52m £27.83m £36.40m
Total expenditure £18.92m £19.72m £21.71m £27.79m £34.41m
Income from government contracts £17.64m £11.87m £12.74m £24.66m £31.92m
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £163.85k £242.11k £339.19k £657.86k £1.12m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £18.72m £19.05m £20.95m £26.93m £33.17m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £10.92k £2.44k £3.86k £6.21k £924
Income - Other £40.38k £63.45k £233.81k £240.93k £2.10m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £18.86m £19.60m £21.55m £27.62m £34.23m
Expenditure - Raising funds £57.96k £121.80k £156.25k £171.09k £176.72k
Expenditure - Governance £89.57k £55.59k £0 £0 £72.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0