Trustees THE SINGLE HOMELESS PROJECT

Charity number: 287779
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jon Rosser Chair 25 September 2019
None on record
Chinyere Ugwu Trustee 16 March 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANSELM,BELMONT
Received: On time
THE FINCHLEY CHARITIES
Received: On time
Meeta Luthra Trustee 16 March 2022
ADVANCE ADVOCACY AND NON-VIOLENCE COMMUNITY EDUCATION
Received: On time
Shahron Shah Trustee 16 March 2022
None on record
Ian Adams Trustee 30 November 2021
AGE UK WESTMINSTER
Received: On time
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE UNITE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
Nicola Anne Boland Trustee 23 September 2020
None on record
Cristina Martinez Fernandez Trustee 15 July 2020
None on record
Peter Brogden Trustee 15 July 2020
None on record
Lindsey Chiswick Trustee 18 March 2015
None on record
Mark Fell Trustee 21 January 2015
None on record