ST JOHN'S CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL, STANMORE PARENTS FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 288052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £16.03k £18.04k £16.94k £9.76k £2.76k
Total expenditure £9.31k £8.67k £8.29k £5.88k £3.20k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A