RIVER THAMES SOCIETY

Charity number: 288380
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £37.34k £37.34k £52.15k £40.64k £34.94k
Total expenditure £33.65k £33.65k £39.60k £43.97k £32.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A