GERMAN WELFARE COUNCIL

Charity number: 288538
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £102.08k £97.91k £95.86k £102.32k £86.07k
Total expenditure £86.35k £92.36k £92.08k £87.84k £92.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A