Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF JULIAN OF NORWICH

Charity number: 289918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 09 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 November 2021 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 09 November 2019 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 09 November 2019 9 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window