BOLTONS GARDEN ENCLOSURES

Charity number: 289951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £71.23k £74.13k £82.69k £87.55k £88.25k
Total expenditure £73.54k £84.08k £83.20k £84.85k £74.80k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A