Kent Enterprise Trust

Charity number: 290211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 18 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 November 2016 On time Download