Kent Enterprise Trust

Charity number: 290211
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £142.86k £148.15k £147.57k £219.63k £169.30k
Total expenditure £169.14k £186.84k £158.64k £209.74k £180.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £8.34k £6.82k N/A N/A