Financial history NORTH PETHERTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 291048
Charity reporting is overdue by 169 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £40.52k £41.78k £30.46k £42.81k £36.34k
Total expenditure £34.17k £35.60k £28.49k £24.10k £32.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £10.00k £18.71k £4.67k