Trustees NORTH PETHERTON COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 291048
Charity reporting is overdue by 174 days

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosalynd Mary Jowett Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
Mary Sylvia Adams Trustee 27 July 2022
None on record
Damian Baker Trustee 25 March 2022
None on record
William Andrew Jennings Trustee 24 March 2022
None on record
BRIAN TURNER Trustee 22 March 2019
None on record
Jenny Manners Trustee 22 March 2019
None on record
JEAN TURNER Trustee 22 March 2019
None on record
Louise Dennis Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record