Financial history BARNES AND MORTLAKE HISTORY SOCIETY

Charity number: 292918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.64k £5.15k £4.97k £4.15k £4.50k
Total expenditure £3.94k £4.52k £4.34k £4.92k £3.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A