17TH PURLEY ST JOHN'S OLD COULSDON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 293899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 10 July 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 05 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 05 June 2017 On time Download