Trustees HOUSING JUSTICE

Charity number: 294666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev ROB WICKHAM Chair 19 June 2018
None on record
Bishop John David Edward Davies Trustee 15 July 2022
ADFERIAD RECOVERY LIMITED
Received: On time
Sharon Mc Loughlin Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Sarah Howard-Jones Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Julie Cook Trustee 03 December 2020
None on record
Richard Drake Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
Aidan Dwan Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
Joe Nicholson Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
Olawunmi Odunaiya Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record
Chrishanti Joanna Shah Trustee 31 December 2013
None on record