TADS THEATRE GROUP

Charity number: 294694
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £13.44k £14.71k £18.50k £28.04k £24.91k
Total expenditure £11.89k £10.41k £16.33k £31.98k £9.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £18.15k